Multiply two digit numbers having 5 as tens digit

Prerequisite for this trick is

  • Should aware of the multiplication table of 5 or value of the square of 5 ( yes! we knew it is 25, that’s it)
  • Should aware of square values from 1 to 9(click here for square numbers)

 

51 x 51 = 2601
52 x 52 = 2704
53 x 53 = 2809
54 x 54 = 2916
55 x 55 = 3025
56 x 56 = 3136
57 x 57 = 3249
58 x 58 = 3364
59 x 59 = 3481

Step 1: Take square value of 5 and ones place value

5×5 = 25 +1 =26

Take square value of ones place

1 x 1 = 01

Step2: place the result in between bot digits.

26_01 = 2601

square of 51 to 52
 

 

 

2 thoughts on “Multiply two digit numbers having 5 as tens digit

  • December 9, 2020 at 6:17 pm
    Permalink

    Great article! We are linking to this great post on our website. Keep up the great writing. Aeriell Ian Undine

    Reply
  • January 30, 2021 at 1:11 pm
    Permalink

    Hey there! This is my first visit to your blog! We are a team of volunteers and starting a new project in a community in the same niche. Your blog provided us valuable information to work on. You have done a marvellous job! Rhianna Findlay Elmo

    Reply

Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *